+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Notification that HB1405 is now Act 255
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
- Received from the House.
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
February 18, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor