+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Notification that HB1258 is now Act 311
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in.
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass, concur in Senate Amendment No. 2
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Returned From Senate as passed, as amended # 2
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as passed as amended.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 2
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on SENATE COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC RETIREMENT AND SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS.
- Received from the House.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Rice
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Rice
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2017: Senate amendment # 2 read and concurred in.
- Yeas: 84
- Present/NV: 16
February 21, 2017: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
January 30, 2017: EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor