+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB104 is now Act 149
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
February 22, 2021: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 2
February 10, 2021: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor