+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB263 is now Act 585
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 26, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
February 27, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor