+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Died in the House at Sine Die
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- The vote by which HB1953 Failed to Pass was expunged.
- Motion by Rep. Collins to expunge the vote of HB1953 passed
- EXPUNGED
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 2
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Re-referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 10, 2017 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Collins
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Collins
+ − Vote
March 22, 2017: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 21
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor