+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Returned From the Senate having failed to pass.
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned To the House as Having Failed to Pass.
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on State Agencies and Governmental Affairs
- Received from the House.
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Motion to reconsider HB2097 passed.
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Read the third time and failed.
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 7, 2011 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on HOUSE RULES
- Filed
+ − Votes (4)
March 30, 2011: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 7
March 18, 2011: Motion to reconsider HB2097 passed.
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 11
March 18, 2011: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 10
March 17, 2011: Read the third time and failed.
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 35
- Present/NV: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor