+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB229 is now Act 449
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the CALENDAR.
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 6, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
March 5, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor