+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Notification that HB1227 is now Act 223
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Correctly enrolled and ordered transmitted to the Governor's Office.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- TO BE ENROLLED
- Returned From the Senate as passed.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to the House as passed.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and placed on the calendar.
- Received from the House.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 2 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC RETIREMENT & SOCIAL SECURITY PROGRAMS-JOINT
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H2
Sponsored by Gossage
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Gossage
+ − Votes (2)
February 25, 2013: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
February 20, 2013: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 4