+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB9 is now Act 9
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On May 20, 2016 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on JUDICIARY COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to Senate Committee on Judiciary
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed