+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/23/2019
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Property Tax
- Read first time
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor