+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 19, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Federalism & Fiscal Responsibility, Select
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
- Read first time
- Co-author authorized
On January 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor