+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 14, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Resolutions Calendars
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Resolutions Calendars
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor