+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Secretary of State
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to County Affairs
- Read first time
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor