+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 28, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor