+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor