+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 9, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 28, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On April 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor