+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/26/2019
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Property Tax
- Read first time
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate