+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On January 14, 2015 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Received from the Senate
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Read
- Laid before the Senate
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor