+ − Actions (40)
On June 19, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On June 3, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On June 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Resolutions Calendar
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 13, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On April 16, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
On April 9, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal
- Read first time
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor