+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Secretary of State
- Signed in the House
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
- Read first time
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/4/2019
- Posting rule suspended
- Considered in public hearing
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/3/2019
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/2/2019
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate