+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (43)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Adopted
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Laid before the House
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Meeting cancelled
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Land & Resource Management
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
- Permission to introduce
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor