+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 28, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On January 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On January 13, 2011 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
On January 12, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
- Laid before the House
- Adopted
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- House passage reported
- Reported enrolled
On January 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Adopted
- Read
- Laid before the Senate
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor