+ − Actions (15)
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On March 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Rules and Resolutions
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules & Resolutions
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor