+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on intent calendar
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Adopted
- Vote recorded in Journal
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor