+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 15, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On April 30, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Resolutions Calendars
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Resolutions Calendars
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor