+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- No action taken in committee
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor