+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- Filed with the Secretary of State
On May 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 24, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
- Read 3rd time
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor