+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Secretary of State
- Signed in the House
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Read
- Laid before the Senate
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor