+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Resolutions Calendars
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Resolutions Calendars
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor