+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Failed of adoption
- Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On May 10, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) offered
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment(s) offered
- Point of order
- Point of order sustained
- Three day rule suspended
- Amendment withdrawn
- Passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reason for vote recorded in Journal
- Reported engrossed
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On December 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor