+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in formal meeting
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Testimony taken in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor