+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- Adopted
- Rules suspended
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor