+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Co-author authorized
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On November 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate