+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On October 14, 2021 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Failed of adoption
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
On October 13, 2021 in the House:
- Record vote
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On October 12, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On October 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On October 4, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On October 1, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On September 28, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
On September 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Constitutional Rights & Remedies
- Read first time
On September 23, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On September 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printing rule suspended
- Filed
- Co-author authorized
- Read first time
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Posting rule suspended
- Scheduled for public hearing on 9/22/2021
- Considered in public hearing
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Reported engrossed
- Ordered not printed
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Adopted
- Record vote
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate