+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amended
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Co-author authorized
On August 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for public hearing on 8/9/2021
- Considered in public hearing
- Testimony taken in committee
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Committee report printed and distributed
On August 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Rules suspended
- Referred to Constitutional Issues, Special
- Read first time
On August 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor