+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 22, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Laid before the House
- Adopted
- Record vote
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 4, 2013 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
- Considered in public hearing
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Left pending in committee
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
On March 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Co-author authorized
- Read 2nd time
- Adopted
- Vote recorded in Journal
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On November 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor