+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Filed with the Secretary of State
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On May 21, 2017 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 6, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On November 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate