+ − Actions (32)
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Constitutional Amendments Calendar
On May 20, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 12, 2009 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 20, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Record vote
- Record vote
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
On April 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Considered in public hearing
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
- Read first time
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor