+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (82)
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Secretary of State
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- House adopts conference committee report
- House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
- Senate adopts conference committee report
- Record vote
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Conf. Comm. Report distributed
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report filed
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- House appoints conferees-reported
- House grants request for conf comm-reported
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- House appoints conferees
- House grants request for conference committee
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate refuses to concur
- House passage as amended reported
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
- Read
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Senate requests conference committee-reported
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate requests conference committee
- Senate appoints conferees
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Senate refuses to concur-reported
- Senate appoints conferees-reported
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
- Record vote
- Adopted as amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Amended
- Read 2nd time
- Laid out in lieu of companion
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
- Committee report distributed
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
- Considered in formal meeting
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendment tabled
- Co-author authorized
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Record vote
- Amendment(s) offered
- Amendment(s) offered
- Record vote
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor