+ − Actions (26)
On May 1, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Ways & Means
- Read first time
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Co-author authorized
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Co-author authorized
On April 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Read first time
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor