+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
- Signed in the House
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Considered in Resolutions Calendars
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Resolutions Calendars
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read & adopted
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor