+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 17, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 21, 2011 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
- House passage reported
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Adopted
- Laid before the House
- Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
- Record vote
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
- Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
On May 18, 2011 in the House:
- Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
On May 6, 2011 in the House:
- Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
- Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
On May 4, 2011 in the House:
- Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
- Considered in public hearing
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On March 31, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- Adopted
- Vote recorded in Journal
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On March 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Committee report printed and distributed
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Administration
- Read first time
On January 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate