+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 17, 2011 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Passed
- Reported engrossed
On May 11, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
- Read first time
- Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
On May 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Record vote
On May 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On May 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On May 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Posting rule suspended
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor