+ − Actions (31)
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Referred to subcommittee
On April 30, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On April 27, 2009 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment(s) offered
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
On April 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor