+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
- Passed
- Read 3rd time
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Laid before the Senate
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On March 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
On March 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business & Commerce
- Read first time
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor