+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to State Affairs
- Read first time
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Co-author authorized
- Three day rule suspended
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
- Record vote
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/6/2021
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Jurisprudence
- Read first time
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor