+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (56)
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective on 9/1/21
- Signed by the Governor
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in the Senate
On May 31, 2021 in the House:
- Signed in the House
On May 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported enrolled
On May 29, 2021 in the House:
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
On May 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Record vote
- Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
- Read
- House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- House passage as amended reported
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Passed to 3rd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Placed on General State Calendar
On May 23, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in Calendars
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report sent to Calendars
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Committee report distributed
- Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably as substituted
- Committee substitute considered in committee
- Considered in formal meeting
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on5/12/2021
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
- Left pending in committee
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Public Health
- Read first time
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Three day rule suspended
- Laid before the Senate
- Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Placed on local & uncontested calendar
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Co-author authorized
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 4/15/2021
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Left pending in committee
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on 3/31/2021
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health & Human Services
- Read first time
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate