+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate