+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Left pending in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
- Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Posting rule suspended
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Land & Resource Management
- Read first time
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- Received from the Senate
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Rules suspended-Regular order of business
- Amendment(s) offered
- Read 2nd time
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment to amendment offered
- Co-author authorized
- Vote reconsidered
- Vote reconsidered
- Amendment amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Amendment adopted as amended
- Vote recorded in Journal
- Passed to engrossment as amended
- Record vote
- Three day rule suspended
- Record vote
- Read 3rd time
- Passed
- Record vote
- Reported engrossed
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
- Co-author authorized
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
- Reported favorably as substituted
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Transportation
- Read first time
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate