+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- Not again placed on intent calendar
On April 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on intent calendar
On April 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee report printed and distributed
- Reported favorably w/o amendments
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Testimony taken in committee
- Considered in public hearing
- Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Criminal Justice
- Read first time
On February 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Received by the Secretary of the Senate
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor